Download free pdf of **CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Worksheets**. Students can easily get all the Class 4 Maths Worksheets and Exercises in Free Printable ( PDF Format) as per the latest syllabus and examination pattern in CBSE and NCERT pattern. Below you will find all the multiplication related sums that are asked in 4th Grade Mathematics Exams Across Indian Schools.

**Multiplication** Worksheets for Class 4 in PDF Format

- CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Worksheet Solved – 3
- CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Worksheet Solved – 2
- CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Worksheet Solved – 1
- Grade 4 Multiplication Worksheets
- CBSE Class 4 Mathematics Multiplication Worksheet
- Multiplication Statement Sums for CBSE Class 4 Maths
- Multiplication Sums for Class 4 Maths Worksheet – 2019
- CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Worksheet – Ramjas
- Multiplication Word Problems for CBSE Class 4 Maths
- Class 4 Maths Multiplication and Division Worksheet
- 4th Class Worksheet on Multiplication Word Problems Solved
- CBSE Class 4 Maths Multiplication Word Problems – Ramjas

### Multiplication Exercises for Class 4 with Answers

**Q.1: Multiply the following 3-digit number by a 2-digit number:**a) 345 x 12 = ?

b) 567 x 23 = ?

c) 789 x 34 = ?

d) 456 x 14 = ?

e) 678 x 25 = ?

f) 890 x 36 = ?

g) 72 x 234 = ?

h) 85 x 345 = ?

i) 96 x 456 = ?

**Answers :**a) 345 x 12 = 4140

b) 567 x 23 = 13041

c) 789 x 34 = 26826

d) 456 x 14 = 6384

e) 678 x 25 = 16950

f) 890 x 36 = 32040

g) 72 x 234 = 16848

h) 85 x 345 = 29325

i) 96 x 456 = 43776

**Q 2: Fill in the blanks with the correct numbers:**a) 345 x ____________ = 1380

b) _____________ x 567 = 6804

c) 789 x _____________ = 14202

d) ________________ x 456 = 9132

e) 678 x _______________ = 2712

f) ______________ x 123 = 615

g) 456 x ____________ = 8208

h) ______________ x 789 = 7101

i) 890 x _______________ = 6230

j) ________________ x 678 = 2712

k) _______________ x 234 = 8190

l) 567 x ______________ = 3969

m) ________________ x 345 = 1035

n) 678 x ______________ = 13560

o) ________________ x 890 = 8900

**Answers:**a) 345 x 4 = 1380

b) 12 x 567 = 6804

c) 789 x 18 = 14202

d) 20 x 456 = 9132

e) 678 x 4 = 2712

f) 5 x 123 = 615

g) 456 x 18 = 8208

h) 9 x 789 = 7101

i) 890 x 7 = 6230

j) 4 x 678 = 2712

k) 35 x 234 = 8190

l) 567 x 7 = 3969

m) 3 x 345 = 1035

n) 678 x 20 = 13560

o) 10 x 890 = 8900

**Multiplication Word Problems with answers **

**Question 1**: The school cafeteria has 5 tables, and each table has 4 students. How many students are there in total?**Answer 1**: There are 5 tables x 4 students = 20 students in total.

**Question 2**: A box contains 6 packets of candies, and each packet has 8 candies. How many candies are there in the box?**Answer 2**: There are 6 packets x 8 candies = 48 candies in the box.

**Question 3**: A farmer has 9 fields, and each field has 7 apple trees. How many apple trees does the farmer have in total?**Answer 3**: The farmer has 9 fields x 7 apple trees = 63 apple trees in total.

**Question 4**: A bookshelf has 4 rows, and each row has 6 books. How many books are there on the bookshelf?**Answer 4**: There are 4 rows x 6 books = 24 books on the bookshelf.

**Question 5**: A toy store has 3 shelves, and each shelf has 10 toy cars. How many toy cars are there in the store?**Answer 5**: There are 3 shelves x 10 toy cars = 30 toy cars in the store.

#### CBSE Class 4 Maths Practice Worksheet PDF Format

**Q. 1 Fill in the blanks.**(a) 7562 × 1 = __________________________

(b) 25 × 36 = __________________× 25

(c) 235 × _______________= 0

(d) ___________× 1 = 365

**(e)**

**54 ×**

**________________**= 540

(f) 4 × ____________= 400

(g) _____________× 10 = 7000

(h) 480 × 1000 = _____________________

**Q.2 Find the product by breaking up one of the numbers.**(a) 512 × 27 (b) 489 × 63

**Q.3 Find the product by grouping two numbers.**(a) 8 × 18 (b) 9 × 18

**Q.4 Find the the following products.**(a) 7 × 30 × 5 (b) 8 × 245 × 125

**Q.5 Find the products.**(a) 14 × 20 (b) 12 × 800 (c) 20 × 90 (d) 15 × 3000

**Q.6 Encircle the same products in each of the following.**(a) 70 × 90 | 700 × 90 | 700 × 9 | 900 × 7 | 900 × 700

(b) 40 × 50 | 50 × 40 | 500 × 4 | 400 × 50 | 40 × 5

**Q.7 How many seconds are there in 251 minutes?**

**Q.8 Which of the following is incorrect? Tick the correct option.**a. 23 × 30 × 57 = 57 × 23 × 30

b. 7 × 300 = 7 × 30 × 10

c. 75 × 50 = 55 × 70

**Q.9 Solve by Multiplication Method.**

- Multiply 403 by 76.
- Multiply 6913 by 8.
- Multiply 3654 by 27.
- Multiply 502 × 237.
- Multiply 1987 × 345.

**Q.10 One chair costs Rs. 2089. What will be the cost of 6 chairs?**

**Q.11 Estimate the product of 476 × 123, by rounding off each number to thenearest ten.**

**Q.12 Estimate the product of 648 × 273, by rounding off each number to thenearest hundred.**

**Q.13 In a bakery, there are 288 buns in a tray. How many buns are there in 9 such trays?**

**Q.14 In a movie theatre, there are 48 seats in a row. There are 26 such rows. How many seats are there in all?**

**Q.15 Estimate the product of 342 × 159, by rounding off each number to the nearest ten.**

**Q.16 Estimate the product of 555 × 111, by rounding off each number to the nearest hundred.**

**Q.17 The cost of 1 cupboard is Rs. 4999. What is the cost of 9 such cupboards?**